VA HB2053 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2053

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0411)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Housing and Community Development; stakeholder advisory group; accessory dwelling units. Directs the Department of Housing and Community Development (the Department) to convene a stakeholder advisory group to evaluate the construction of internal, attached, and detached accessory dwelling units as a strategy to address the Commonwealth's growing demand for affordable and market-rate housing. The bill requires the stakeholder advisory group to report its findings, including any legislative recommendations, to the Director of the Department, the Secretary of Commerce and Trade, the commissioners of the Virginia Housing Development Authority, and the Virginia Housing Commission no later than November 1, 2021, and allows a possible extension but to no later than November 1, 2022. Department of Housing and Community Development; stakeholder advisory group; accessory dwelling units. Directs the Department of Housing and Community Development (the Department) to convene a stakeholder advisory group to evaluate the construction of internal, attached, and detached accessory dwelling units as a strategy to address the Commonwealth's growing demand for affordable and market-rate housing. The bill requires the stakeholder advisory group to report its findings, including any legislative recommendations, to the Director of the Department, the Secretary of Commerce and Trade, the commissioners of the Virginia Housing Development Authority, and the Virginia Housing Commission no later than November 1, 2021, and allows a possible extension but to no later than November 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Affordable and market-rate housing; DHCD to evaluate growing demand.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0411)
2021-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 411 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2053ER)
2021-03-09HouseEnrolled
2021-02-25SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
2021-02-25SenateRead third time
2021-02-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N)
2021-02-17SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-17SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
2021-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N)
2021-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2053H1
2021-02-04HouseCommittee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 21104312D-H1
2021-02-04HouseCommittee on Counties, Cities and Towns amendment rejected
2021-02-04HouseRead second time
2021-02-03HouseRead first time
2021-02-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 21104312D-H1
2021-02-03HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2021-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-29HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-29HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N)
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Land Use
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102679D

Same As/Similar To

HB2053 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2053
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2053+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2053H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2053ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0411+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2053AH
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2053AHR
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2053F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2053FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2053FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0702C0007+HB2053
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H07C0037+HB2053
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0201C0011+HB2053
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02C0108+HB2053
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1499+HB2053
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0141+HB2053
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12V0049+HB2053
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0099+HB2053
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0397HB2053+HB2053
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0459HB2053+HB2053

Bill Comments

feedback