VA HB2053 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2053
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Housing and Community Development; stakeholder advisory group; accessory dwelling units. Directs the Department of Housing and Community Development (Department) to convene a stakeholder advisory group to evaluate the construction of internal, attached, and detached accessory dwelling units as a strategy to address the Commonwealth's growing demand for affordable and market-rate housing. The bill requires the stakeholder advisory group to report its findings and recommendations, including any legislative recommendations, to the Director of the Department, the Secretary of Commerce and Trade, the commissioners of the Virginia Housing Development Authority, and the Virginia Housing Commission no later than November 1, 2021. Department of Housing and Community Development; stakeholder advisory group; accessory dwelling units. Directs the Department of Housing and Community Development (Department) to convene a stakeholder advisory group to evaluate the construction of internal, attached, and detached accessory dwelling units as a strategy to address the Commonwealth's growing demand for affordable and market-rate housing. The bill requires the stakeholder advisory group to report its findings and recommendations, including any legislative recommendations, to the Director of the Department, the Secretary of Commerce and Trade, the commissioners of the Virginia Housing Development Authority, and the Virginia Housing Commission no later than November 1, 2021.
Title
Affordable & market-rate housing; DHCD to evaluate growing demand.
Sponsors
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] |
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2053H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 21104312D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns amendment rejected |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104312D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102679D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2053 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)