VA HB2053 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Admission of in-state students at public institutions of higher education. Provides that the board of visitors or other governing body of each public institution of higher education, except for the Virginia Military Institute, Norfolk State University, and Virginia State University, must establish rules and regulations requiring that at least 75 percent of students admitted and enrolled at the institution be Virginia domiciles.
Title
Higher educational institutions; board of visitors set rules so 75% enrolled be Virginia domiciles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Assigned App. sub: Higher Education | |
2011-01-31 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-31 | House: Referred from Education by voice vote | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Education sub: #4 Higher Education and Arts | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100984D |