VA HB2052 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Richmond; runoff elections. Provides that the procedures and deadlines for voter registration, applying for an absentee ballot, and casting an absentee ballot for any runoff election in the City of Richmond shall be as provided under state law for general elections. This bill is identical to SB 1193.
Title
Richmond, City of; amending charter, runoff elections.
Sponsors
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 306 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2052ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2052H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105134D-H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105134D-H1 |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101982D |