VA HB2050 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia housing opportunity tax credit. Establishes, starting in taxable year 2021, a Virginia housing opportunity tax credit, which is equal to the amount of the federal low-income housing tax credit allocated or allowed by the Virginia Housing Development Authority to a low-income building that is eligible for the federal credit. The credit would be nonrefundable and could be carried forward for up to five years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia housing opportunity; tax credit established starting in taxable year 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Finance
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
2021-01-16HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102648D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581439.29(n/a)See Bill Text
581439.30(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback