VA HB2050 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0038)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0038)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Severance of tenancy by the entireties by written instrument. Clarifies that a husband and wife may own real or personal property as tenants by the entirety for as long as they are married. The bill provides that, in order to sever a tenancy by the entireties by written instrument, the instrument must be a deed that is signed by both spouses as grantors of the property. This bill is in response to Evans v. Evans, Record No. 141277, 772 S.E.2d 576, 2015 Va. LEXIS 84 (2015), and, as introduced, was a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.
Title
Tenancy; severance by the entireties by written instrument.
Sponsors
Del. Les Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0038) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 38 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 20, 2017 | |
2017-02-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/13/17 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2050ER) |
2017-02-10 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 17100722D-E |
2017-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2050E |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100722D |