VA HB205 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Small renewable energy projects; permit by rule process. Provides that any proposed wind energy project with a project boundary located less than two miles from a jurisdictional boundary is not qualified for a permit by rule from the Department of Environmental Quality. The measure also (i) requires the engineering certification for a wind energy project to state the amount of energy projected to be generated by the facility, on an annual average basis, based on wind studies conducted at the proposed project site for a minimum of two years; (ii) requires the Department to hold a public hearing; (iii) limits eligibility for wind-powered generation facilities to make use of the permit by rule process to those that have a rated capacity not exceeding 100 megawatts and disturb fewer than 50 acres in the complete construction of the project including access roads; and (iv) reduces the maximum capacity for facilities that generate electricity only from sunlight from 150 megawatts to 100 megawatts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small renewable energy projects; permit by rule process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Labor and Commerce
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
2020-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-15HouseReferred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
2019-12-27HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-12-27HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102268D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011197.5(n/a)See Bill Text
1011197.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback