VA HB205 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Criteria for remedial redistricting plans. Provides criteria by which congressional and state legislative districts are to be drawn when such districts have been declared unlawful or unconstitutional, in whole or in part, by order of any state or federal court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redistricting; criteria for remedial plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N)
2018-01-22HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-12-28HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2017-12-28HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103588D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242304.04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback