VA HB2049 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Assistance for certain voters outside of the polling place; definition of disability. Limits the entitlement of voters with disabilities to vote outside the polls to those whose disability prevents them from entering the polling place. Expands the definition of disability for purposes of providing assistance outside of a polling place to voters with disabilities to include any permanent or temporary disability. Under current law, the disability is limited to a permanent or temporary physical disability.
Title
Polling place; assistance for certain voters, definition of disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2023-01-31 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100155D |