VA HB2047 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2047
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal proceedings; consideration of mental condition and intellectual and developmental disabilities. Permits the admission of evidence concerning a defendant's mental condition at the time of an alleged offense, including expert testimony, if such evidence (i) tends to show the defendant did or did not have the specific mental state required for the offense charged and (ii) is otherwise admissible pursuant to the general rules of evidence. The bill provides that to establish a mental condition for such purposes, the defendant must show that his condition existed at the time of the offense and that such condition satisfies the diagnostic criteria for (a) an autism spectrum disorder as defined in the most recent edition of the Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders published by the American Psychiatric Association or (b) an intellectual or developmental disability. If a defendant intends to present such evidence, the bill requires him or his counsel to give notice in writing to the attorney for the Commonwealth within specified time periods. The bill also clarifies that a diagnosis of an intellectual or developmental disability shall be considered by a judicial officer for the purpose of rebuttal of a presumption against bail and that a court may order that a sentencing report prepared by a probation officer contain any diagnosis of an intellectual or developmental disability. The bill also adds to the requirements to be met for qualification as a court-appointed attorney two hours of continuing legal education, which shall cover the representation of individuals with behavioral or mental health disorders and individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities. Criminal proceedings; consideration of mental condition and intellectual and developmental disabilities. Permits the admission of evidence concerning a defendant's mental condition at the time of an alleged offense, including expert testimony, if such evidence (i) tends to show the defendant did or did not have the specific mental state required for the offense charged and (ii) is otherwise admissible pursuant to the general rules of evidence. The bill provides that to establish a mental condition for such purposes, the defendant must show that his condition existed at the time of the offense and that such condition satisfies the diagnostic criteria for (a) an autism spectrum disorder as defined in the most recent edition of the Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders published by the American Psychiatric Association or (b) an intellectual or developmental disability. If a defendant intends to present such evidence, the bill requires him or his counsel to give notice in writing to the attorney for the Commonwealth within specified time periods. The bill also clarifies that a diagnosis of an intellectual or developmental disability shall be considered by a judicial officer for the purpose of rebuttal of a presumption against bail and that a court may order that a sentencing report prepared by a probation officer contain any diagnosis of an intellectual or developmental disability. The bill also adds to the requirements to be met for qualification as a court-appointed attorney two hours of continuing legal education, which shall cover the representation of individuals with behavioral or mental health disorders and individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities.
Title
Criminal proceedings; consideration of mental condition and intellectual, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Sally Hudson [D] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2047H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103892D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103892D-H1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101702D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2047 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 271.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 299 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |