VA HB2046 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices. Prohibits any locality, its employees, or its appointed commissions from discriminating (i) in the application of local land use ordinances or guidelines, or in the permitting of housing developments, on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, elderliness, familial status, source of funds, sexual orientation, gender identity, status as a veteran, or disability; (ii) in the permitting of housing developments because the housing development contains or is expected to contain affordable housing units occupied or intended for occupancy by families or individuals with incomes at or below 80 percent of the median income of the area where the housing development is located or is proposed to be located; or (iii) by prohibiting or imposing conditions upon the rental or sale of dwelling units, provided that the provisions of this subsection shall not be construed to prohibit ordinances related to short-term rentals. The bill provides that it shall not be a violation of the Virginia Fair Housing Law if land use decisions or decisions relating to the permitting of housing developments are based upon considerations of limiting high concentrations of affordable housing. The bill also requires the Fair Housing Board, after determining the existence of an unlawful discriminatory housing practice and after consultation with the Attorney General, to immediately refer the matter to the Attorney General for civil action. Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices. Prohibits any locality, its employees, or its appointed commissions from discriminating (i) in the application of local land use ordinances or guidelines, or in the permitting of housing developments, on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, elderliness, familial status, source of funds, sexual orientation, gender identity, status as a veteran, or disability; (ii) in the permitting of housing developments because the housing development contains or is expected to contain affordable housing units occupied or intended for occupancy by families or individuals with incomes at or below 80 percent of the median income of the area where the housing development is located or is proposed to be located; or (iii) by prohibiting or imposing conditions upon the rental or sale of dwelling units, provided that the provisions of this subsection shall not be construed to prohibit ordinances related to short-term rentals. The bill provides that it shall not be a violation of the Virginia Fair Housing Law if land use decisions or decisions relating to the permitting of housing developments are based upon considerations of limiting high concentrations of affordable housing. The bill also requires the Fair Housing Board, after determining the existence of an unlawful discriminatory housing practice and after consultation with the Attorney General, to immediately refer the matter to the Attorney General for civil action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Fair Housing Law; unlawful discriminatory housing practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (77-Y 22-N) (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-29HouseVOTE: Passage (77-Y 22-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House (77-Y 22-N)
2021-01-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2046H1
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103489D-H1
2021-01-28HouseRead second time
2021-01-27HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103489D-H1
2021-01-26HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N)
2021-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101269D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2046
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2046+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2046H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21102915D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103489.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103489D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2046F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2046FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1102V0048+HB2046
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H11V0056+HB2046
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1261+HB2046
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12V0140+HB2046

Bill Comments

feedback