VA HB2046 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public employment; nondiscrimination. Prohibits discrimination in public employment based on race, color, religion, national origin, sex, pregnancy, childbirth or related medical conditions, age, marital status, disability, sexual orientation, or status as a veteran. The bill defines "sexual orientation" as a person's actual or perceived heterosexuality, bisexuality, homosexuality, or gender identity or expression. The bill expressly provides that "sexual orientation" shall not include any person's attraction towards persons with whom sexual conduct would be illegal due to the age of the parties. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Public employment; nondiscrimination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2011-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100795D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1500.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 295.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2046 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2046+hil |