VA HB2045 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; certification of recovery residences; regulations; civil penalties. Provides for the promulgation of regulations for the certification of recovery residences by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. The bill defines "recovery residence" as a housing facility that provides alcohol-free and illicit-drug-free housing to individuals with substance abuse disorders and individuals with co-occurring mental illnesses and substance abuse disorders that does not include clinical treatment services. The bill prohibits any person from advertising, representing, or otherwise implying to the public that a recovery residence or other housing facility is a certified recovery residence unless it is certified by the Department. The bill authorizes the Department to assess a civil penalty for violations of this prohibition. Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; certification of recovery residences; regulations; civil penalties. Provides for the promulgation of regulations for the certification of recovery residences by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. The bill defines "recovery residence" as a housing facility that provides alcohol-free and illicit-drug-free housing to individuals with substance abuse disorders and individuals with co-occurring mental illnesses and substance abuse disorders that does not include clinical treatment services. The bill prohibits any person from advertising, representing, or otherwise implying to the public that a recovery residence or other housing facility is a certified recovery residence unless it is certified by the Department. The bill authorizes the Department to assess a civil penalty for violations of this prohibition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recovery residences; certification by Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 220 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2045ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-29HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2045H1
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105077D-H1
2019-01-25HouseRead second time
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105077D-H1
2019-01-22HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101781D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
372431.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2045
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2045+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2045H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2045ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0220+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1203V0003+HB2045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0024+HB2045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1931+HB2045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0223+HB2045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2045+HB2045
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB2045+HB2045

Bill Comments

feedback