VA HB2045 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Foster care and adoption; decisions regarding federal benefits; appeal to the Commissioner. Establishes a right to review by the Commissioner of Social Services of any decision of a local board of social services granting, denying, or changing a benefit available to a child in foster care for any individual whose claim for benefits related to foster care services available pursuant to state or federal law is denied or is not acted upon by the local department with reasonable promptness.
Title
Foster care and adoption; decisions regarding federal benefits, right to appeal to Commissioner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 437 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2045ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 13101381D-E |
2013-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2045E |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101381D |