VA HB2045 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-27 - House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-27 - House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Housing; definition of blighted property. Expands the definition of blighted property to include any residential structure (i) for which a building permit was not obtained or the building permit has been revoked or has expired in accordance with the Uniform Statewide Building Code and (ii) which endangers the public's health, safety, or welfare.
Title
Blighted property; expands definition to include any residential structure.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-27 | House: Passed by in General Laws with letter by voice vote | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by with letter by voice vote | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101527D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2045 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2045+hil |