VA HB2043 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Child care providers; background checks; portability. Exempts prospective employees and volunteers of certain child welfare agencies from statutory background check requirements where the individual completed a background check within the previous five years, provided that (i) such background check was conducted after July 1, 2017; (ii) the results of such background check indicated that the individual had not been convicted of any barrier crime and was not the subject of a founded complaint of child abuse or neglect; and (iii) the individual is an employee or volunteer of any child welfare agency that is subject to background check requirements or has been separated from such employment or volunteer position for not more than 180 days. The bill requires such child welfare agencies, prior to hiring or allowing to volunteer any individual without the completion of a background check, to obtain written certification from the Department of Social Services that such individual satisfies all requirements set forth above and is eligible to serve as an employee or volunteer at the child welfare agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child care providers; background checks, portability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - House: Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31HouseTabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 1-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 1-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102124D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192389(n/a)See Bill Text
6321720.1(n/a)See Bill Text
6321724(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback