VA HB2042 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Assault and battery against a family or household member; prior conviction; mandatory minimum term of confinement. Provides that upon a conviction for assault and battery against a family or household member where it is alleged in the warrant, petition, information, or indictment on which a person is convicted that such person has been previously convicted of an offense that occurred within a period of 10 years of the instant offense against a family or household member of (i) assault and battery against a family or household member, (ii) malicious wounding or unlawful wounding, (iii) aggravated malicious wounding, (iv) malicious bodily injury by means of a substance, (v) strangulation, or (vi) an offense under the law of any other jurisdiction that has the same elements of any of the above offenses such person is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor and the sentence of such person shall include a mandatory minimum term of confinement of 60 days.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault and battery against a family or household member; prior conviction, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (46-Y 52-N) (Y: 46 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 93-N) (Y: 0 N: 93 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 12-N) (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03HouseCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED (46-Y 52-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (46-Y 52-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-26HouseGovernor's substitute printed 19107809D-H2
2019-03-26HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2042ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 12-N)
2019-02-21HouseConference report agreed to by House (87-Y 12-N)
2019-02-21 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Howell, Obenshain, Peake
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-20HouseDelegates: Murphy, Bell, Robert B., Gilbert
2019-02-20HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-20HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-19SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-19SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 93-N)
2019-02-15HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 93-N)
2019-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate with amendment (36-Y 3-N)
2019-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-13SenateAmendment by Senator Petersen agreed to
2019-02-13SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 5-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 12-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (85-Y 12-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2042H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105044D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105044D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 5-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103707D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18257.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2042
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2042+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2042H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2042ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2042H2+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0079+HB2042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0120+HB2042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2466+HB2042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0257+HB2042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0538HB2042+HB2042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0584HB2042+HB2042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0590HB2042+HB2042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0591HB2042+HB2042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2872+HB2042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0784HB2042+HB2042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3251+HB2042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1038HB2042+HB2042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3380+HB2042

Bill Comments

feedback