VA HB2042 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Suicide prevention; continuing education requirements for providers. Requires continuing education related to suicide assessment, treatment, and management for all licensed doctors of medicine, osteopathy, and chiropractic medicine; licensed physician assistants; licensed nurse practitioners; licensed occupational therapists; licensed registered nurses; licensed practical nurses; licensed physical therapists and physical therapy assistants; licensed counselors, substance abuse treatment practitioners, and marriage and family therapists; licensed psychologists; and licensed social workers.
Title
Suicide prevention; continuing education requirements for providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101435D |
Subjects
Continuing Education
Health
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Professional and Occupational Regulation
Suicide
Health
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Professional and Occupational Regulation
Suicide
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2912.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3474 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3505.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3606.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2042 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2042+hil |