VA HB2040 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Correctional officers; arrest without a warrant during transportation of inmate. Adds the escape of an inmate while being transported by a correctional officer to the crimes for which a correctional officer is authorized to arrest without a warrant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional officers; arrest without a warrant during transportation of inmate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2023-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2023-01-21HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100657D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19281.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback