VA HB2038 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Recordation tax; refinancing deeds of trust. Exempts from recordation tax deeds of trust or mortgages that refinance an existing deed of trust or mortgage on which the recordation tax was paid within the last two years.
Title
Recordation tax; refinancing deeds of trust.
Sponsors
Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Finance |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100232D |
Subjects
Deeds and Deeds of Trust
Financial Institutions and Services
Mortgages
Property and Conveyances
Recordation Tax
Taxation
Financial Institutions and Services
Mortgages
Property and Conveyances
Recordation Tax
Taxation
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2038 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2038+hil |