VA HB2036 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Prima facie evidence of intent to commit larceny by employed caregiver of an adult. Provides that in any prosecution of an employed caregiver of an adult for larceny, the pawning of property by such caregiver shall be prima facie evidence of intent to commit larceny of such property if (i) the property belongs to the adult the caregiver is employed to care for; (ii) the caregiver cares for such adult in the adult's home; (iii) the caregiver is not a family or household member of such adult; and (iv) the caregiver does not receive written authorization to take and pawn such property prior to pawning it.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Larceny; prima facie evidence of intent to commit by employed caregiver of an adult.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100732D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18296.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback