VA HB2036 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Registration with Department of Criminal Justice Services by tow truck drivers; exceptions. Exempts from registration with the Department of Criminal Justice Services tow truck drivers who are (i) not for hire in the Commonwealth, (ii) transporting a vehicle from a location outside of the Commonwealth to a destination within the Commonwealth, or (iii) transiting the Commonwealth while transporting a vehicle from a location outside of the Commonwealth to a destination outside of the Commonwealth.
Title
Tow truck drivers; exempts registration with DCJS, exceptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Transportation |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101724D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2036 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2036+hil |