VA HB2036 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Purchase, etc., of tobacco products by minors; liquid nicotine packaging; penalty. Provides that no person shall sell or distribute at retail a liquid nicotine container on or after October 1, 2015, unless the container is packaged in child-resistant packaging. The bill allows existing inventory to be sold until January 1, 2016. Any person who violates the child-resistant packaging requirements is guilty of a Class 4 misdemeanor. The bill also provides that any adult may sign for tobacco products, nicotine vapor products, or alternative nicotine products purchased through mail order or the Internet. Current law requires the signature of the purchaser.
Title
Nicotine Vapor products; prohibits purchase, etc., by minors, packaging, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 739 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2036ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's substitute printed 15105828D-H3 |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2036ER) |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105139D-S1 (94-Y 0-N)' |
2015-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2036S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105139D-S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105139D-S1 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2036H2 |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Nat. Resources agreed to 15104754D-H2 |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute from Courts of Justice rejected 15104488D-H1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104754D-H2 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104488D-H1 |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103496D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1325 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0756)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 371.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 4220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 4221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |