VA HB2034 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2034
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; nonjurisdictional customers; third party power purchase agreements. Provides that for pilot programs under which an owner or operator of a renewable energy generation facility sells electricity to an eligible customer-generator through a third party power purchase agreement, both jurisdictional and nonjurisdictional customers may participate on a first-come, first-serve basis.
Title
Electric utilities; nonjurisdictional customers, third party power purchase agreements.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0361) | |
2021-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 361 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2034ER) |
2021-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-22 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-19 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101254D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2034 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
SB1420 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
SB1420 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
SB1420 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)
SB1420 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0362)