VA HB2034 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

General registrars; petition for removal. Provides for the removal of a general registrar by the circuit court upon a petition signed by a majority of members of the local electoral board. Currently, a local electoral board may remove a general registrar with a majority vote. The bill requires the Virginia Division of Risk Management to assign counsel to the defense of any member of a local electoral board or general registrar subject to a petition for removal, upon that member's or registrar's application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local electoral boards and general registrars; removal from office by circuit court, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 42-N) (Y: 53 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto
2019-03-25 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2034ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
2019-02-19SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2019-02-19SenateCommittee amendment reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateRead third time
2019-02-18SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-18SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-18SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-18SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (8-Y 6-N)
2019-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-01HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (53-Y 42-N)
2019-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (53-Y 42-N)
2019-01-31HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2034H1
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105130D-H1
2019-01-31HouseRead second time
2019-01-30HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105130D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
2019-01-12HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100419D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242103(n/a)See Bill Text
242109(n/a)See Bill Text
242234(n/a)See Bill Text
242234.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242235(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2034
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2034+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2034H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2034ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1802V0006+HB2034
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H18V0010+HB2034
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2118+HB2034
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S08V0114+HB2034
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2034+HB2034
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0826HB2034+HB2034
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0827HB2034+HB2034

Bill Comments

feedback