VA HB2034 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act. Adds two new disclosures required to be made by a seller of residential real property to a purchaser, one for whether the property is subject to one or more conservation or other easements and a second for whether the property is subject to a community development authority approved by a local governing body. The bill also (i) adds a definitions section for the Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act, (ii) provides for electronic delivery of required disclosures, and (iii) provides that the required disclosures provided by the Real Estate Board appear on its website. The bill has numerous technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; adds two new disclosures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-13 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
2017-03-13 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 386 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2034ER)
2017-02-24HouseEnrolled
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2017-02-20SenateRead third time
2017-02-17SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateRereferred to Courts of Justice
2017-02-16SenateMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2017-02-16SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2017-02-16SenateReading of amendments waived
2017-02-16SenateRead third time
2017-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2017-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2017-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2017-01-24HouseRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-23HouseRead first time
2017-01-19HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2017-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2017-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103790D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2034
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2034+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2034ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0386+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1101V0006+HB2034
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H11V0030+HB2034
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1574+HB2034
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S12V0153+HB2034
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0554HB2034+HB2034
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S03V0315+HB2034
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0694HB2034+HB2034
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0695HB2034+HB2034
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0696HB2034+HB2034
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2606+HB2034

Bill Comments 750

feedback