VA HB2034 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Temporary delegation of parental or legal custodial powers; child-placing agency. Allows a parent or legal custodian of a minor to delegate to another person by a properly executed power of attorney any powers regarding care, custody, or property of the minor for a period not exceeding one year. The bill also exempts from the requirement to obtain a license as a child-placing agency a private, nonprofit organization that does not accept public funds and that assists parents with the process of delegating parental and legal custody of their children, including assistance with identifying appropriate placements for their children, or that provides services and resources to support parents and legal guardians to whom custody has been transferred pursuant to a temporary delegation of parental or legal custodial powers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental/legal custodial powers; temporary delegation, exemption from licensure for certain agency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-10HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2015-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2015-01-20HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil Law
2015-01-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2015-01-14HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100586D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632100(n/a)See Bill Text
6321715(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback