VA HB2034 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Repeal of land preservation tax credit. Repeals the land preservation tax credit effective January 1, 2014. The bill provides that such repeal would in no way affect any land preservation tax credits issued prior to such date or the administration of the same.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land preservation tax credit; repealing effective January 1, 2014.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-05HouseLeft in Finance
2013-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N)
2013-01-14HouseAssigned Finance sub: #3
2013-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2013-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100767D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813(n/a)See Bill Text
581510(n/a)See Bill Text
581513(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback