VA HB2032 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB2032

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0509)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Employment; domestic service. Provides that individuals who are engaged in providing domestic service are not excluded from employee protection laws. Employment; domestic service. Provides that individuals who are engaged in providing domestic service are not excluded from employee protection laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employees providing domestic service; application of laws applicable to employee safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0509)
2021-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 509 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2032ER)
2021-03-09HouseEnrolled
2021-02-27SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2021-02-25HouseVOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 44-N)
2021-02-25HouseConference report agreed to by House (54-Y 44-N)
2021-02-25HouseConference substitute printed 21200710D-H1
2021-02-25 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2021-02-25SenateSenators: Lucas, McClellan, Stuart
2021-02-25SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2021-02-24HouseDelegates: Gooditis, Price, Avoli
2021-02-24HouseConferees appointed by House
2021-02-24HouseHouse acceded to request
2021-02-23SenateSenate requested conference committee
2021-02-23SenateSenate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
2021-02-22HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 21200211D-S1 (0-Y 96-N)
2021-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-18SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N)
2021-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2032S1
2021-02-18SenatePassed by temporarily
2021-02-18SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21200211D-S1
2021-02-18SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-18SenateRead third time
2021-02-17SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N)
2021-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-15SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-15SenateCommittee substitute printed 21200211D-S1
2021-02-15SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-02HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N)
2021-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N)
2021-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 21102809D-E
2021-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2032E
2021-02-01HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-02-01HouseRead second time
2021-01-29HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N)
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102809D

Same As/Similar To

HB2032 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4012(n/a)See Bill Text
40149.3(n/a)See Bill Text
40149.8(n/a)See Bill Text
652101(n/a)See Bill Text
652305(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2032
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2032+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2032E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2032S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2032H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2032ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0509+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2032AH
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2032AC
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2032FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2032FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2032FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1401C0024+HB2032
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H14C0083+HB2032
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1334+HB2032
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S02C0063+HB2032
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S02V0039+HB2032
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0042+HB2032
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0114HB2032+HB2032
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0173HB2032+HB2032
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1836+HB2032
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0308HB2032+HB2032
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1995+HB2032
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0521HB2032+HB2032

Bill Comments

feedback