VA HB2032 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2032
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Employment; domestic service. Provides that individuals who are engaged in providing domestic service are not excluded from employee protection laws and the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act. Employment; domestic service. Provides that individuals who are engaged in providing domestic service are not excluded from employee protection laws and the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act.
Title
Employees providing domestic service; application of laws applicable to employee safety.
Sponsors
Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102809D-E |
2021-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2032E |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (12-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102809D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2032 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 1 | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 49.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 49.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |