VA HB2032 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Freedom of Information Act; electronic meetings. Allows regional public bodies to conduct electronic meetings in the same manner as state public bodies. The bill also removes the requirement that a public body hold one meeting each year at which no member participates using electronic means. This bill is a recommendation of the Joint Commission on Technology and Science.
Title
Virginia FOIA; allows regional public bodies to conduct electronic meetings.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] | Del. Randall Minchew [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement |
2013-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-16 | House | Reported from Science and Technology (17-Y 5-N) |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100580D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Computer Services and Uses
Consumer Protection
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Computer Services and Uses
Consumer Protection
Counties, Cities, and Towns