VA HB2031 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2031

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Facial recognition technology; authorization of use by local law-enforcement agencies and campus police departments at public institutions of higher education. Provides that no local law-enforcement agency or campus police department shall purchase or deploy facial recognition technology, defined in the bill, unless such purchase or deployment is expressly authorized by statute. The bill prohibits a local law-enforcement agency or campus police department at a public institution of higher education currently using facial recognition technology from continuing to use such technology without such authorization after July 1, 2021. Facial recognition technology; authorization of use by local law-enforcement agencies and campus police departments at public institutions of higher education. Provides that no local law-enforcement agency or campus police department shall purchase or deploy facial recognition technology, defined in the bill, unless such purchase or deployment is expressly authorized by statute. The bill prohibits a local law-enforcement agency or campus police department at a public institution of higher education currently using facial recognition technology from continuing to use such technology without such authorization after July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facial recognition technology; authorization of use by local law-enforcement agencies, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537)
2021-04-07HouseEnacted, Chapter 537 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-04-07SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2021-04-07HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2021-04-07HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2031ER2)
2021-04-07HouseReenrolled
2021-04-07 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2021-04-07SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2021-04-07HouseVOTE: Adoption (99-Y 1-N)
2021-04-07HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 1-N)
2021-04-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-03-31HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2031ER)
2021-02-22HouseEnrolled
2021-02-18HouseVOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-16SenatePassed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2021-02-16SenateAmendments by Senator McDougle agreed to
2021-02-16SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-16SenateRead third time
2021-02-15SenatePassed by for the day
2021-02-15SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-02-15SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-15SenateRead third time
2021-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-10SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-21HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2021-01-21HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HousePrinted as engrossed 21101718D-E
2021-01-20HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2031E
2021-01-20HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-20HouseRead second time
2021-01-19HouseRead first time
2021-01-18HouseReported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101718D

Same As/Similar To

HB2031 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521723.2(n/a)See Bill Text
231815.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2031
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2031+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2031E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2031ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2031ER2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0537+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2031AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200035A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2031AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2031ASE
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2031AG
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2031FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2031FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H21C0009+HB2031
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC0990+HB2031
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC0996+HB2031
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0139+HB2031
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12V0026+HB2031
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0014HB2031+HB2031
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0054HB2031+HB2031
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1733+HB2031
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV2074+HB2031
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0624HB2031+HB2031

Bill Comments

feedback