VA HB2031 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Facial recognition technology; authorization of use by local law-enforcement agencies and public institutions of higher education. Allows a locality or a public institution of higher education to authorize a local law-enforcement agency or campus police department to purchase or deploy facial recognition technology, which is defined in the bill. The bill prohibits a local law-enforcement agency or public institution of higher education currently using facial recognition technology from continuing to use such technology without such authorization after July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facial recognition technology; authorization of use by local law-enforcement agencies, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-21HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2021-01-21HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HousePrinted as engrossed 21101718D-E
2021-01-20HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2031E
2021-01-20HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-20HouseRead second time
2021-01-19HouseRead first time
2021-01-18HouseReported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101718D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521723.2(n/a)See Bill Text
231815.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback