VA HB2030 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2030
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Neonicotinoid pesticides; study. Directs the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to study the Beekeeper Pollinator Protection Plan and voluntary best management practices for the purpose of proposing improvements to communication between beekeepers and applicators to reduce the risk to pollinators from neonicotinoid pesticides. The bill authorizes the Department to establish a stakeholder working group and directs it to report on its findings no later than December 1, 2021. Neonicotinoid pesticides; study. Directs the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to study the Beekeeper Pollinator Protection Plan and voluntary best management practices for the purpose of proposing improvements to communication between beekeepers and applicators to reduce the risk to pollinators from neonicotinoid pesticides. The bill authorizes the Department to establish a stakeholder working group and directs it to report on its findings no later than December 1, 2021.
Title
Neonicotinoid pesticides; communication between beekeepers and applicators.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (87-Y 10-N) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458) | |
2021-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 458 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 20201 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2030ER) |
2021-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (87-Y 10-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 21200429D-S2 (87-Y 10-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB2030S2 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Petersen agreed to 21200429D-S2 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 21200338D-S1 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21200429D-S2 (Petersen) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21200338D-S1 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 7-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (66-Y 34-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (66-Y 34-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2030H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103859D-H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103859D-H1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102676D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2030 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 926.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 3929.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |