VA HB2030 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Neonicotinoid pesticides; notice; civil penalty. Prohibits any person from applying an aerosolized neonicotinoid insecticide for personal use unless the person (i) is certified or under the direct supervision of a certified applicator or (ii) provides 24 hours' notice to the owner of any managed beehive within the line of sight of the application area. A person who violates the prohibition shall be subject to a civil penalty of $100. Neonicotinoid pesticides; notice; civil penalty. Prohibits any person from applying an aerosolized neonicotinoid insecticide for personal use unless the person (i) is certified or under the direct supervision of a certified applicator or (ii) provides 24 hours' notice to the owner of any managed beehive within the line of sight of the application area. A person who violates the prohibition shall be subject to a civil penalty of $100.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Neonicotinoid pesticides; application in residentially zoned outdoor areas, civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (66-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Passage (66-Y 34-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (66-Y 34-N)
2021-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2030H1
2021-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103859D-H1
2021-01-29HouseRead second time
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103859D-H1
2021-01-27HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
2021-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102676D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152926.5(n/a)See Bill Text
323900(n/a)See Bill Text
323929.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback