VA HB2029 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2029
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Fire Programs; prohibition on the use of certain oriented strand board in fire training activities. Prohibits the burning by any person, local government, or agency of the Commonwealth of Class A fuel materials that contain oriented strand board, defined in the bill, during fire training activities. Department of Fire Programs; prohibition on the use of certain oriented strand board in fire training activities. Prohibits the burning by any person, local government, or agency of the Commonwealth of Class A fuel materials that contain oriented strand board, defined in the bill, during fire training activities.
Title
Fire training activities; prohibition on the use of certain oriented strand board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 81 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-29 | House | VOTE: Passage (81-Y 18-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (81-Y 18-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102658D-E |
2021-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2029E |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102658D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2029 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)