VA HB2029 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Concealed handgun permits; fees; background check; exemption for permit holders. Provides that a licensed firearms dealer does not have to have a criminal background check performed to determine a person's eligibility to purchase a firearm if the purchaser possesses a valid concealed handgun permit and presents a photo ID issued by an agency of the Commonwealth or the Department of Defense. The bill increases from $10 to $20 the fee charged by the circuit court clerk for processing an application and issuing a permit. The bill also sets at $30 the maximum fee that is charged for conducting a background investigation of an applicant for a concealed handgun permit. Of this maximum $30 fee, $10 must be paid to the State Police to cover its costs associated with processing the application and the local law-enforcement agency may charge a fee not to exceed the remaining $20. The bill also requires that the State Police, in preparing the report from the Central Criminal Records Exchange for the circuit court with regard to an applicant for a concealed handgun permit, shall initiate a search of the National Instant Criminal Background Check System for purposes of obtaining criminal history record information regarding the applicant. The bill also provides that an applicant for a concealed handgun permit must include his alien number or admission number if he is not a citizen of the United States. Finally, the bill provides that a person is disqualified from obtaining a concealed handgun permit if he is otherwise disqualified from possessing or receiving a firearm pursuant to state or federal law.
Title
Concealed handgun permits; background check, exemption for permit holders.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Riley Ingram [R] | Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] |
Del. Charles Poindexter [R] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 67 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 67 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 35-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (65-Y 35-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2029H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104235D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104235D-H1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (15-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103116D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.013 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |