VA HB2028 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Absentee ballots; witness requirement; printed name and residence address. Requires that a witness to a voter's absentee ballot provide, in addition to his signature, his printed name and residence address.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee ballots; witness requirement, printed name and residence address.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned P & E sub: Election Administration
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101619D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242702.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242706(n/a)See Bill Text
242707(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback