VA HB2027 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2027
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Standards of Learning assessments; reading and mathematics; grades three through eight; individual student growth. Requires the Board of Education to establish, in lieu of a one-time end-of-year assessment and for the purpose of providing measures of individual student growth over the course of the school year, a through-year growth assessment system, aligned with the Standards of Learning, for the administration of reading and mathematics assessments in grades three through eight. The bill requires such through-year growth assessment system to include at least one beginning-of-year and one end-of-year assessment in order to provide individual student growth scores over the course of the school year, provided that the total time scheduled for taking all such assessments shall not exceed 150 percent of the time scheduled for taking a single end-of-year proficiency assessment. The bill requires the Department of Education to ensure adequate training for teachers and principals on how to interpret and use student growth data from such assessments to improve reading and mathematics instruction in grades three through eight throughout the school year. The bill requires such through-year growth assessment system to be fully implemented in each local school division no later than the 2024-2025 school year. Standards of Learning assessments; reading and mathematics; grades three through eight; individual student growth. Requires the Board of Education to establish, in lieu of a one-time end-of-year assessment and for the purpose of providing measures of individual student growth over the course of the school year, a through-year growth assessment system, aligned with the Standards of Learning, for the administration of reading and mathematics assessments in grades three through eight. The bill requires such through-year growth assessment system to include at least one beginning-of-year and one end-of-year assessment in order to provide individual student growth scores over the course of the school year, provided that the total time scheduled for taking all such assessments shall not exceed 150 percent of the time scheduled for taking a single end-of-year proficiency assessment. The bill requires the Department of Education to ensure adequate training for teachers and principals on how to interpret and use student growth data from such assessments to improve reading and mathematics instruction in grades three through eight throughout the school year. The bill requires such through-year growth assessment system to be fully implemented in each local school division no later than the 2024-2025 school year.
Title
Standards of Learning; reading and mathematics assessments for grades three through eight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2027H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 21103824D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee on Education amendments rejected |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103824D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2021-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102777D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2027 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)