VA HB2027 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Action against parents for minor knowingly possessing a firearm on school property; civil liability. Creates a civil cause of action against the parent, guardian, legal custodian, or other person standing in loco parentis of a minor for injury to the person or property of another or for wrongful death resulting from the minor knowingly possessing a firearm on school property if it can be shown by clear and convincing evidence that the minor came into possession of such firearm because of the failure of the civil defendant to reasonably secure the firearm. The bill provides that any recovery from the parent, guardian, legal custodian, or other person standing in loco parentis of such minor shall not preclude full recovery from such minor, except to the amount of recovery from such parent, guardian, legal custodian, or other person standing in loco parentis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Action against parents for minor knowingly possessing on school property, civil liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101996D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80144.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback