VA HB2027 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
In-state tuition; active duty members. Allows any active duty member, activated guard or reservist member, or guard or reservist member mobilized or on temporary active orders for six months or more to pay no more than the in-state tuition rate to attend a public institution of higher education if he resides in Virginia. Currently, such an individual is required to be stationed or assigned to work in Virginia and reside in Virginia to receive the rate of no more than in-state tuition.
Title
Tuition, in-state; active duty member, etc. mobilized or on temporary active orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302) | |
2013-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 302 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2027ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 13102277D-E |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2027E |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-28 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education and Arts |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102277D |