VA HB2025 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2025

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; record exclusion for personal contact information provided to a public body. Provides that personal contact information provided to a public body or any of its members for the purpose of receiving electronic communications from the public body or any of its members is excluded from the mandatory disclosure provisions of FOIA, unless the recipient of such electronic communications indicates his approval for the public body to disclose such information. Currently, the law provides protections for personal contact information provided to a public body, not to its members; only applies to electronic mail; and requires the electronic mail recipient to request the public body not to disclose his personal contact information in order for the information to be exempt from mandatory disclosure. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia FOIA; record exclusion for personal contact information provided to a public body.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484)
2021-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 484 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2025ER)
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-26HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-22HouseRead first time
2021-01-21HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101440D

Same As/Similar To

HB2025 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223705.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2025
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2025+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2025ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0484+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2025F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2025FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1104C0003+HB2025
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11C0044+HB2025
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1128+HB2025
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0137+HB2025
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12V0054+HB2025
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB2025+HB2025
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0280HB2025+HB2025

Bill Comments 750

feedback