VA HB2025 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2025
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; record exclusion for personal contact information provided to a public body. Provides that personal contact information provided to a public body or any of its members for the purpose of receiving electronic communications from the public body or any of its members is excluded from the mandatory disclosure provisions of FOIA, unless the recipient of such electronic communications indicates his approval for the public body to disclose such information. Currently, the law provides protections for personal contact information provided to a public body, not to its members; only applies to electronic mail; and requires the electronic mail recipient to request the public body not to disclose his personal contact information in order for the information to be exempt from mandatory disclosure. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council.
Title
Virginia FOIA; record exclusion for personal contact information provided to a public body.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101440D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2025 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)