VA HB2025 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Driver privilege cards; penalty. Authorizes the Driver privilege cards; penalty. Authorizes the issuance of new driver privilege cards by the Department of Motor Vehicles to an applicant who (i) has reported income from Virginia sources on an individual tax return filed with the Commonwealth in the preceding 12 months and (ii) is not in violation of the insurance requirements for the registration of an uninsured motor vehicle. The bill provides that driver privilege cards shall confer the same privileges and shall be subject to the same provisions as driver's licenses and permits; however, driver privilege cards shall not (a) confer voting privileges, (b) permit an individual to waive any part of the driver examination, or (c) have their issuance be contingent upon the applicant's ability to produce proof of legal presence in the United States. The bill provides for the term "driver's license" to consistently refer to all driver's licenses, permits, driver privilege cards, and special identification cards issued by the Commonwealth or the comparable law of another jurisdiction. The bill allows the issuance of a limited-duration driver's license and special identification card to an applicant presenting valid documentary evidence that a federal court or federal agency having jurisdiction over immigration has authorized the applicant to be in the United States for a period of at least 30 days from the date of application. The bill authorizes the Tax Commissioner to provide to the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles information sufficient to verify that an applicant for a driver privilege card or permit reported income from Virginia sources on an individual tax return filed with the Commonwealth in the preceding 12 months.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver privilege cards; penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Transportation
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103137D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12119(n/a)See Bill Text
161228(n/a)See Bill Text
16169.40:1(n/a)See Bill Text
171293(n/a)See Bill Text
182268.1(n/a)See Bill Text
1826(n/a)See Bill Text
192258.1(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.7(n/a)See Bill Text
223808.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221205(n/a)See Bill Text
242410.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242411.1(n/a)See Bill Text
242416.7(n/a)See Bill Text
242643(n/a)See Bill Text
321291.2(n/a)See Bill Text
332613(n/a)See Bill Text
3822212(n/a)See Bill Text
41305(n/a)See Bill Text
462328.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462328.3(n/a)See Bill Text
462330(n/a)See Bill Text
462332(n/a)See Bill Text
462333.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462335(n/a)See Bill Text
462343(n/a)See Bill Text
5813(n/a)See Bill Text
591442(n/a)See Bill Text
591443.3(n/a)See Bill Text
6321916(n/a)See Bill Text
6321941(n/a)See Bill Text
801313(n/a)See Bill Text
801420.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback