VA HB2025 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0476)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0476)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Noise abatement practices and technologies. Provides that first consideration should be given to the use of noise reducing design and low noise pavement materials for highway projects that require mitigation of traffic noise. The bill also clarifies use of vegetative screening when visual screening is required.
Title
Noise abatement practices; use of noise reducing design and pavement materials for highway projects.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0476) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 476 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-21 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2025ER) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Printed as engrossed 11101100D-E | |
2011-01-21 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB2025E | |
2011-01-21 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-01-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-20 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-18 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101100D |