VA HB2023 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Lawn care service providers; limit on use of fertilizer; civil penalty. Authorizes a locality to, by ordinance, limit the amount and number of applications of fertilizer a lawn care service provider is permitted to apply in a given area in a 12-month period. A lawn care service provider that violates such ordinance shall be subject to a civil penalty, not to exceed $50 for the first violation or violations arising from the same set of operative facts. The civil penalty for subsequent violations not arising from the same set of operative facts within 12 months of the first violation shall not exceed $200.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lawn care service providers; limit on use of fertilizer, civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101113D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152901.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback