VA HB2023 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highway maintenance payments; bicycle lanes. Provides that cities and towns that receive highway maintenance payments from the Commonwealth based on moving-lane-miles of highway will not have such payments reduced if moving-lane-miles of highway are converted to bicycle-only lanes, provided that the number of moving-lane-miles is not more than 50 moving-lane-miles or three percent of the municipality's total number of moving-lane-miles, whichever is less, and that prior to such conversion the city or town certifies that the conversion design has been assessed by a professional engineer and designed in accordance with certain national standards. Municipalities will not receive additional funds and cannot reduce their funding of road and street maintenance after a conversion. The bill also repeals the provision that allowed the City of Richmond to convert 20 moving-lane-miles to bicycle-only lanes.
Title
Highway maintenance payments; bicycle lanes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 534 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2023ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102193D |