VA HB2019 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2019

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public elementary and secondary schools; possession and administration of undesignated stock albuterol inhalers and valved holding chambers. Requires each local school board to adopt and implement policies for the possession and administration of undesignated stock albuterol inhalers and valved holding chambers in every public school in the local school division, to be administered by any school nurse, employee of the school board, employee of a local governing body, or employee of a local health department who is authorized by the local health director and trained in the administration of albuterol inhalers and valved holding chambers for any student believed in good faith to be in need of such medication. The bill requires the Department of Education, in conjunction with the Department of Health, to develop and implement policies for the administration of stock albuterol in public schools. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022. Public elementary and secondary schools; possession and administration of undesignated stock albuterol inhalers and valved holding chambers. Requires each local school board to adopt and implement policies for the possession and administration of undesignated stock albuterol inhalers and valved holding chambers in every public school in the local school division, to be administered by any school nurse, employee of the school board, employee of a local governing body, or employee of a local health department who is authorized by the local health director and trained in the administration of albuterol inhalers and valved holding chambers for any student believed in good faith to be in need of such medication. The bill requires the Department of Education, in conjunction with the Department of Health, to develop and implement policies for the administration of stock albuterol in public schools. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public elementary and secondary schools; administration of undesignated stock albuterol inhalers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (86-Y 12-N) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 18-N) (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 0 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508)
2021-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 508 (effective - see bill)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 20201
2021-02-27SenateSigned by President
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2019ER)
2021-02-26HouseEnrolled
2021-02-24HouseVOTE: Adoption (86-Y 12-N)
2021-02-24HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 21200123D-S1 (86-Y 12-N)
2021-02-23HousePassed by for the day
2021-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate with substitute (37-Y 2-N)
2021-02-22SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2019S1
2021-02-22SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21200123D-S1
2021-02-22SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
2021-02-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 21200123D-S1
2021-02-10SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-28HouseVOTE: Passage (82-Y 18-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House (82-Y 18-N)
2021-01-27HousePrinted as engrossed 21102599D-E
2021-01-27HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2019E
2021-01-27HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-27HouseRead second time
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseReported from Education with amendment(s) (16-Y 6-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Pre-K-12
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102599D

Same As/Similar To

HB2019 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221274.2(n/a)See Bill Text
5413408(n/a)See Bill Text
801225(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2019
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2019+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2019E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2019S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2019ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0508+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2019AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200123D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2019F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2019F164+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2019FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2019FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2019FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0901C0072+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H09C0040+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1232+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0144+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0073+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB2019+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0279HB2019+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1931+HB2019

Bill Comments

feedback