VA HB2019 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0390)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Residential real property; required disclosures; stormwater management facilities. Provides that the owner of residential real property under the Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act must include in the residential property disclosure statement provided to a potential purchaser of residential property a statement that the owner makes no representations with respect to the existence or recordation of any maintenance agreement for any stormwater detention facilities on the property, and that advises the potential purchaser to take whatever due diligence steps they deem necessary to determine the presence of any such facilities or agreements, such as contacting his settlement provider, consulting the locality in which the property is located, or reviewing any survey of the property that may have been conducted. The bill also requires the Common Interest Community Board to include notice that regular annual or special assessments paid by the owner to the association may be used for the construction or maintenance of stormwater management facilities in the form that accompanies association disclosure packets that are required to be provided to all prospective purchasers of lots located within a development that is subject to the Virginia Property Owners' Association Act and resale certificates provided to purchasers of units located in a condominium that is subject to the Condominium Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential real property; required disclosures of stormwater management facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0390)
2019-03-14 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 390 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2019ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2019H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105719D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105719D-H1
2019-01-31HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101112D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2019
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2019+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2019H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2019ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0390+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1104V0022+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0098+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2361+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0154+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2019+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0893HB2019+HB2019

Bill Comments 750

feedback