VA HB2019 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0694)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Transportation network company partner vehicle registration repeal. Removes the requirement that a transportation network company (TNC) partner register his personal vehicle for use as a TNC partner vehicle with the Department of Motor Vehicles. The bill allows the Department of State Police to recognize another state's annual motor vehicle safety inspection in lieu of a Virginia inspection and clarifies that a TNC partner can keep proof of inspection in or on the vehicle. The bill contains an emergency clause. This bill is identical to SB 1366.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation network company partner; vehicle registration repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0694)
2017-03-24 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 694 (effective 3/24/17)
2017-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
2017-02-20SenateSigned by President
2017-02-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-17HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2019ER)
2017-02-17HouseEnrolled
2017-02-15HouseVOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-13SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2017-02-13SenateEmergency clause added
2017-02-13SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-13SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-02-13SenateRead third time
2017-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-08SenateReported from Transportation with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2017-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-01-27HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
2017-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
2017-01-26HousePrinted as engrossed 17103824D-E
2017-01-26HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2019E
2017-01-26HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-01-26HouseRead second time
2017-01-25HouseRead first time
2017-01-24HouseReported from Transportation with amendment (20-Y 1-N)
2017-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
2017-01-17HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103824D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4622000(n/a)See Bill Text
4622001.3(n/a)See Bill Text
4622011.20(n/a)See Bill Text
4622011.29(n/a)See Bill Text
4622099.50(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2019
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2019+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2019E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2019ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0694+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1904V0007+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H19V0023+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1672+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S11V0082+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0464HB2019+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0471HB2019+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2381+HB2019

Bill Comments 750

feedback